|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6220.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4450.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4598.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|