LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1841
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1841
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1841
Compare Versions
AB1841 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB1841 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1841 Amended June 3, 2010
AB1841 Amended April 6, 2010
AB1841 Amended March 18, 2010
AB1841 Introduced February 12, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1841 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB1841 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1841 Amended June 3, 2010
AB1841 Amended April 6, 2010
AB1841 Amended March 18, 2010
AB1841 Introduced February 12, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare