|
09/10/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 221, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2010
|
Approved by the acting Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6951.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5070.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Ducheny.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1225.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|