LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB185
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB185
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB185
Compare Versions
AB185 Chaptered September 10, 2010
AB185 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB185 Amended August 27, 2010
AB185 Amended March 18, 2010
AB185 Amended February 17, 2010
AB185 Amended September 4, 2009
AB185 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB185 Chaptered September 10, 2010
AB185 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB185 Amended August 27, 2010
AB185 Amended March 18, 2010
AB185 Amended February 17, 2010
AB185 Amended September 4, 2009
AB185 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare