California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB185 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/27/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 185AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 27, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 18, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 INTRODUCED BY  Committee on Budget   (   Evans (Chair), Arambula, Beall, Blumenfield, Brownley, Caballero, Carter, De La Torre, Feuer, Hill, Huffman, Monning, Ruskin, and Swanson   )   Assembly Member   Buchanan   (   Principal coauthor:   Assembly Member   John A. Perez   )  FEBRUARY 2, 2009  An act relating to the Budget Act of 2010, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.   An act relating to education, and making an appr   opriation therefor, to take effect immediately, usual and current expenses.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 185, as amended,  Committee on Budget   Buchanan  .  Budget Act of 2010.   Education: federal funds.   Existing law, the Budget Act of 2009, makes appropriations from various funds in support of elementary, secondary, and postsecondary education.   This bill would appropriate $903,845,000 from the Federal Trust Fund, pursuant to a specified schedule, to the State Department of Education, the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, the University of California, and the California State University for the 2009-10 fiscal year.   This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as a usual and current expense of the state.   The California Constitution requires the Governor to submit to the Legislature a budget for the ensuing fiscal year, and requires the Legislature to pass the budget by a specified date.   This bill would provide that the Budget Act of 2010 shall not include specified amounts to reflect various savings or reductions.   This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute.  Vote:  2/3   majority  . Appropriation:  no   yes  . Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   The sum of nine hundred three million eight hundred forty-five thousand dollars ($903,845,000) is hereby appropriated for the 2010-11 fiscal year, payable from the Federal Trust Fund, for allocation pursuant to the following schedule:   (a) To the State Department of Education, for allocation to local educational agencies, pursuant to the following programs and subschedule:   (1) 10.30.004-School Improvement $64,082,000   Grant   (2) 10.30.016-School $351,763,000   Improvements Grants (ARRA)   (A) The funds appropriated in subschedules (1) and (2) are for the purpose of supporting three-year school improvement grants to local educational agencies, to be provided over a three-year period.   (B) The funds shall be allocated to local educational agencies to fund school improvement grants based on school size as approved by the State Board of Education on August 24, 2010.   (C) The appropriation of funds in subschedules (1) and (2) is contingent upon approval of California's request to the United States Department of Education for a waiver to allocate 100 percent of the funds in a manner consistent with subparagraph (B).   (b) To the Office of Planning and Research, for transfer for purposes of reimbursement pursuant to the following subschedule:   (1) State Department of Education $271,000,000   (2) Board of Governors of the   California $5,000,000   Community Colleges   (3) University of California $106,000,000   (4) California State University $106,000,000   (A) The funds appropriated in subschedule (1) are for the purpose of reimbursement of local education agencies for mitigating revenue limits reductions and reductions made to basic aid districts.   (B) The funds appropriated in subschedules (2) to (4), inclusive, are for the purpose of reimbursement to the entities in these subschedules for mitigating reductions made to the California Community Colleges, the University of California, and the California State University.   (C) The funds are for expenditure pursuant to Title XIV of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act (ARRA) and related guidance for the federal State Fiscal Stabilization Fund (SFSF) Phase II grant award.   SEC. 2.   This act makes an appropriation for the usual current expenses of the state within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect.   SECTION 1.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $17,377,000 in Item 0250-111-0001 to implement certain provisions of the Omnibus Conservatorship and Guardianship Reform Act of 2006.   SEC. 2.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $41,000,000 in Item 0820-001-0001, and shall not include $4,102,000 in Item 0820-003-0001, for operation of, and lease-revenue payments for, state criminal laboratories.   SEC. 3.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $5,000,000 in Item 3600-001-0001.   SEC. 4.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $811,000,000 in Item 5225-002-0001 to reflect reduced expenditures for inmate medical care.   SEC. 5.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $41,280,000 in Item 5225-001-0001, and shall not include $6,720,000 in Item 5225-011-0001, to reflect a reduction in the number of juvenile wards supervised by the state.   SEC. 6.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $227,990,000 to recognize the suspension or deferral of noneducation local mandates.   SEC. 7.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include at least $140,000,000 in appropriations from the General Fund to reflect information technology and related savings achieved by state agencies pursuant to the Governor's Reorganization Plan No. 1 of 2009 or Section 11545 of the Government Code.   SEC. 8.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $449,600,000 in appropriations from the General Fund to reflect savings from implementing the 5-percent reduction to departmental personnel costs resulting from Executive Order S-01-10. It is the intent of the Legislature that first priority for achieving these personnel savings come from administration, including, but not limited to, agency, headquarters, and central offices, and that every effort be made to avoid negative impacts on the delivery of direct services.   SEC. 9.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $130,000,000 in appropriations from the General Fund to reflect the Operating Expenses and Equipment savings resulting from Executive Order S-01-10.   SEC. 10.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $98,100,000 in appropriations from the General Fund to reflect savings from delaying prepayment of other postemployment benefits.   SEC. 11.   The Budget Act of 2010 shall not include $28,300,000 in Item 4260-101-0001 to recognize additional antifraud activities to be conducted by the Department of Health Care Services in the Medi-Cal program.   SEC. 12.   This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: This act implements various savings and reductions related to the Budget for the 2010-11 fiscal year and it is imperative that these changes be made at the earliest possible time. It is therefore necessary that this act go into immediate effect.