BILL NUMBER: AB 185ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 27, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 18, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Buchanan (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member John A. Perez) FEBRUARY 2, 2009 An act relating to education, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, usual and current expenses. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 185, Buchanan. Education: federal funds. Existing law, the Budget Act of 2009, makes appropriations from various funds in support of elementary, secondary, and postsecondary education. This bill would appropriate $903,845,000 from the Federal Trust Fund, pursuant to a specified schedule, to the State Department of Education, the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, the University of California, and the California State University for the 2010-11 fiscal year. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as a usual and current expense of the state. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The sum of nine hundred three million eight hundred forty-five thousand dollars ($903,845,000) is hereby appropriated for the 2010-11 fiscal year, payable from the Federal Trust Fund, for allocation pursuant to the following schedule: (a) To the State Department of Education, for allocation to local educational agencies, pursuant to the following programs and subschedule: (1) 10.30.004-School Improvement $64,082,000 Grant (2) 10.30.016-School $351,763,000 Improvements Grants (ARRA) (A) The funds appropriated in subschedules (1) and (2) are for the purpose of supporting three-year school improvement grants to local educational agencies, to be provided over a three-year period. (B) The funds shall be allocated to local educational agencies to fund school improvement grants based on school size as approved by the State Board of Education on August 24, 2010. (C) The appropriation of funds in subschedules (1) and (2) is contingent upon approval of California's request to the United States Department of Education for a waiver to allocate 100 percent of the funds in a manner consistent with subparagraph (B). (b) To the Office of Planning and Research, for transfer for purposes of reimbursement pursuant to the following subschedule: (1) State Department of Education $271,000,000 (2) Board of Governors of the California $5,000,000 Community Colleges (3) University of California $106,000,000 (4) California State University $106,000,000 (A) The funds appropriated in subschedule (1) are for the purpose of reimbursement of local education agencies for mitigating revenue limits reductions and reductions made to basic aid districts. (B) The funds appropriated in subschedules (2) to (4), inclusive, are for the purpose of reimbursement to the entities in these subschedules for mitigating reductions made to the California Community Colleges, the University of California, and the California State University. (C) The funds are for expenditure pursuant to Title XIV of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act (ARRA) and related guidance for the federal State Fiscal Stabilization Fund (SFSF) Phase II grant award. SEC. 2. This act makes an appropriation for the usual current expenses of the state within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect.