|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 6901.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4836.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Corrected June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5404.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|