LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1889
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1889
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1889
Compare Versions
AB1889 Enrolled September 10, 2010
AB1889 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1889 Amended August 17, 2010
AB1889 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1889 Amended June 30, 2010
AB1889 Amended June 22, 2010
AB1889 Amended May 6, 2010
AB1889 Amended March 17, 2010
AB1889 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1889 Enrolled September 10, 2010
AB1889 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1889 Amended August 17, 2010
AB1889 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1889 Amended June 30, 2010
AB1889 Amended June 22, 2010
AB1889 Amended May 6, 2010
AB1889 Amended March 17, 2010
AB1889 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare