California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1894 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 4, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2010

Amended

Bill June 10, 2010
Bill April 15, 2010
Bill April 7, 2010