LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1894
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1894
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1894
Compare Versions
AB1894 Chaptered August 13, 2010
AB1894 Enrolled August 4, 2010
AB1894 Amended June 10, 2010
AB1894 Amended April 15, 2010
AB1894 Amended April 7, 2010
AB1894 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1894 Chaptered August 13, 2010
AB1894 Enrolled August 4, 2010
AB1894 Amended June 10, 2010
AB1894 Amended April 15, 2010
AB1894 Amended April 7, 2010
AB1894 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare