|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4372.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5454.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|