California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1896 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 6, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 23, 2010

Amended

Bill May 28, 2010
Bill April 19, 2010