|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4374.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5159.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|