California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1908 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/23/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1908CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 166 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 23, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 23, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 5, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 13, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 11, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Cook and Carter FEBRUARY 16, 2010 An act to amend Sections 5068 and 5069 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1908, Cook. Vehicles: specialized license plates: Veterans' organizations. Under existing law, the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) issues environmental and other specialized license plates, including veterans' organization license plates. Those license plates are required to have a distinctive design or decal. The issuance of those license plates is subject to additional fees, the revenue from which, less the DMV's costs, is required to be deposited in the Veterans Service Office Fund, except that 1/2 of a specified additional fee is required to be deposited in the California Environmental License Plate Fund. Existing law requires money in the Veterans Service Office Fund to be available, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to the Department of Veterans Affairs for allocation and disbursement to counties for the operation of county veterans service offices. This bill would authorize the Department of Veterans Affairs to modify the distinctive design or decal for those veterans' organization license plates. The bill would authorize those newly designed plates or decals to be issued only after all existing plates or decals have been issued. The bill also would delete the requirement that 1/2 of the specified additional fee be deposited in the California Environmental License Plate Fund, and, instead, would require all revenue from those additional fees, less the DMV's costs, to be deposited in the Veterans Service Office Fund. The bill would require the DMV, by July 1, 2011, to maintain on its Internet Web site, a link to order online the veterans' organization license plates. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5068 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5068. (a) (1) (A) A veterans' organization may apply either individually or with other veterans' organizations to meet the application threshold set forth in Section 5060 for special interest plates. An organization that meets the minimum application requirement by applying with other organizations under this subdivision shall be issued a regular license plate bearing a distinctive design or decal approved under subdivision (a) of Section 5060. (B) The Department of Veterans Affairs may modify the distinctive design or decal described in subparagraph (A), consistent with the design criteria imposed by Section 5060. Special interest plates issued under this section and bearing the modified design or decal shall be issued only after all existing plates or decals have been issued. (2) Special interest plates issued under this section may be issued in a combination of numbers or letters, or both, requested by the owner or lessee of the vehicle, to be displayed in addition to the design or decal authorized under paragraph (1), subject to Section 5105. (b) In addition to the regular fees for an original registration, a renewal of registration, or a transfer of registration, the following fees shall be paid by individuals applying for a veterans' organization special interest license plate or decal: (1) Thirty dollars ($30) for the initial issuance of the plates and decals. The plates shall be permanent and shall not be required to be replaced. (2) Thirty dollars ($30) for each renewal of registration that includes the continued display of the plates or decals. (3) Fifteen dollars ($15) for transfer of the plates to another vehicle. (4) Thirty-five dollars ($35) for replacement plates, if they become damaged or unserviceable. (5) Ten dollars ($10) for replacement decals, if they become damaged or unserviceable. (6) Forty dollars ($40) for the personalization of the plates, as authorized under paragraph (2) of subdivision (a). (c) By July 1, 2011, the department shall maintain on its Internet Web site, a link to order online the special interest plates issued pursuant to this section. SEC. 2. Section 5069 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5069. Revenue derived from the additional special fees provided in Section 5068, less costs incurred by the department pursuant to this article, shall be deposited in the Veterans Service Office Fund, created by Section 972.2 of the Military and Veterans Code.