|
07/19/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5924.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4091.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4859.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|