LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1911
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1911
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1911
Compare Versions
AB1911 Chaptered July 19, 2010
AB1911 Enrolled July 1, 2010
AB1911 Amended June 24, 2010
AB1911 Amended May 19, 2010
AB1911 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1911 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1911 Chaptered July 19, 2010
AB1911 Enrolled July 1, 2010
AB1911 Amended June 24, 2010
AB1911 Amended May 19, 2010
AB1911 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1911 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare