|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 5428.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 33. Page 5428.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 40. Noes 32. Page 4862.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Davis.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|