California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1919 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2010

Amended

Bill August 18, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 21, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010