|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6222.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4453.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4938.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|