California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1927 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Amended

Bill August 4, 2010
Bill June 9, 2010
Bill May 24, 2010
Bill April 20, 2010
Bill March 9, 2010