California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1930 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill July 15, 2010
Bill April 29, 2010