LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1930
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1930
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1930
Compare Versions
AB1930 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB1930 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1930 Amended July 15, 2010
AB1930 Amended April 29, 2010
AB1930 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1930 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB1930 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1930 Amended July 15, 2010
AB1930 Amended April 29, 2010
AB1930 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare