|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 6875.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 4937.)
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 5187.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|