California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1942 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010