|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6164.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 4405.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4942.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|