California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 5, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 22, 2010