|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6607.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4799.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5390.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|