California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1963 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill August 4, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 21, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010
Bill April 13, 2010