|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 6473.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4668.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 5405.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|