California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1985 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 21, 2010