|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6396.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 6396.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4585.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 4448.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|