LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1999
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1999
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1999
Compare Versions
AB1999 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB1999 Enrolled August 24, 2010
AB1999 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1999 Amended June 2, 2010
AB1999 Amended May 6, 2010
AB1999 Amended March 18, 2010
AB1999 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1999 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB1999 Enrolled August 24, 2010
AB1999 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1999 Amended June 2, 2010
AB1999 Amended May 6, 2010
AB1999 Amended March 18, 2010
AB1999 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare