|
07/19/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4202.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5159.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|