LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2023
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2023
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2023
Compare Versions
AB2023 Chaptered July 19, 2010
AB2023 Enrolled July 2, 2010
AB2023 Amended April 27, 2010
AB2023 Amended March 25, 2010
AB2023 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2023 Chaptered July 19, 2010
AB2023 Enrolled July 2, 2010
AB2023 Amended April 27, 2010
AB2023 Amended March 25, 2010
AB2023 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare