|
08/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 5016.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4833.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wyland. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4847.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5235.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|