California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2036 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/27/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2036CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 371 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 27, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 30, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 27, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bill Berryhill FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to add Sections 10111.2 and 20103.7 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2036, Bill Berryhill. Public contracts: contract document distribution. Existing law, the State Contract Act and the Local Agency Public Construction Act, sets forth the procedures pursuant to which state and local agencies may solicit and evaluate bids or proposals for, and award, contracts for the construction of public works. The State Contract Act requires a department, as defined, to comply with its provisions. This bill would require a state department and a local agency, upon request from a contractor plan service, to provide an electronic copy of a project's contract documents to the contractor plan room at no charge. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 10111.2 is added to the Public Contract Code, to read: 10111.2. A department shall, upon request from a contractor plan room service, provide an electronic copy of a project's contract documents at no charge to the contractor plan room. SEC. 2. Section 20103.7 is added to the Public Contract Code, to read: 20103.7. A local agency subject to this chapter taking bids for the construction of a public work or improvement shall, upon request from a contractor plan room service, provide an electronic copy of a project's contract documents at no charge to the contractor plan room. SEC. 3. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.