|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 541, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6575.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4794.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4942.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|