California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 19, 2010
Bill June 21, 2010
Bill March 24, 2010