08/12/2010 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/02/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |||
06/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5160.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5). | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |