|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 6778.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Passed on file.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4847.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 4937.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|