California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2072 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 17, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 9, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010
Bill April 13, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010