|
08/31/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 16. Noes 21. Page 5114.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 20. Noes 14. Page 4913.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4913.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 5487.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|