LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2092
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2092
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2092
Compare Versions
AB2092 Amended August 18, 2010
AB2092 Amended August 2, 2010
AB2092 Amended June 28, 2010
AB2092 Amended June 15, 2010
AB2092 Amended April 20, 2010
AB2092 Amended April 6, 2010
AB2092 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2092 Amended August 18, 2010
AB2092 Amended August 2, 2010
AB2092 Amended June 28, 2010
AB2092 Amended June 15, 2010
AB2092 Amended April 20, 2010
AB2092 Amended April 6, 2010
AB2092 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare