|
09/04/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1824.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 25).
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|