LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB21
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB21
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB21
Compare Versions
AB21 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB21 Amended September 12, 2009
AB21 Amended September 4, 2009
AB21 Amended April 2, 2009
AB21 Amended March 18, 2009
AB21 Amended February 18, 2009
AB21 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB21 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB21 Amended September 12, 2009
AB21 Amended September 4, 2009
AB21 Amended April 2, 2009
AB21 Amended March 18, 2009
AB21 Amended February 18, 2009
AB21 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare