LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB211
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB211
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB211
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 2, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 3, 2010
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 29, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 17, 2010
Compare
Bill
July 8, 2009
Compare
Bill
June 1, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 14, 2009
Compare