LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB211
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB211
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB211
Compare Versions
AB211 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB211 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB211 Amended August 17, 2010
AB211 Amended July 8, 2009
AB211 Amended June 1, 2009
AB211 Amended April 14, 2009
AB211 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB211 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB211 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB211 Amended August 17, 2010
AB211 Amended July 8, 2009
AB211 Amended June 1, 2009
AB211 Amended April 14, 2009
AB211 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare