|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 543, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6485.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4712.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5343.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and INS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|