LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2111
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2111
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2111
Compare Versions
AB2111 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2111 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB2111 Amended August 16, 2010
AB2111 Amended June 14, 2010
AB2111 Amended May 6, 2010
AB2111 Amended April 22, 2010
AB2111 Amended April 12, 2010
AB2111 Amended March 23, 2010
AB2111 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2111 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2111 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB2111 Amended August 16, 2010
AB2111 Amended June 14, 2010
AB2111 Amended May 6, 2010
AB2111 Amended April 22, 2010
AB2111 Amended April 12, 2010
AB2111 Amended March 23, 2010
AB2111 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare