|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 5478.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 4600.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|